Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Samaniego Jaca

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1679Born
1 Dec 172142.8AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
8 Feb 172243.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
20 Sep 172849.6AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
28 Apr 174162.2ResignedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
3 Mar 174465.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Samaniego Jaca
Archbishop Manuel Samaniego Jaca (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLogroño

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,578
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 130, and Page 369
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 40, Number 145
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast