Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop García Pardiñas Villar de Francos, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1672BornLa Coruña
15 Apr 172048.3AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
9 Jun 172048.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
29 Mar 174169.2DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for García Pardiñas Villar de Francos:
Bishop García Pardiñas Villar de Francos O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 37, Number 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013