Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph (Josip) Salecz (Žalec)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

Titular Bishop of Medea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1763³BornZagreb
31 Jul 178522.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Jul 178623.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 182158.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
27 Jun 182158.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Medea
5 Aug 182158.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medea
1833¹69.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph (Josip) Salecz (Žalec) (VIAF: 305550227)
Bishop Joseph (Josip) Salecz (Žalec) (born , died 1833) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 259
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016