Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gonzaga, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1546¹Born
1579¹33.0AppointedMinister General of Order of Observant Friars Minor
26 Oct 158741.8AppointedBishop of Cefalù, Italy
15 Nov 158741.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalù, Italy
29 Jan 159347.0AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
30 Apr 159347.3AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
10 May 159650.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
1599¹53.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
2 Mar 162074.1DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gonzaga (VIAF: 62356719)
Bishop Francesco Gonzaga O.F.M. Obs. (born 1546, died ) Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova, Diocese of Mantova
Ordained BishopS. François, Mantova, Diocese of Mantova

  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 230, and Page 273
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163, and Page 269
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Nov 2012
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast