Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme (Étienne) Rouchouze, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Oceania

Titular Bishop of Nilopolis

Titular See: (lost at sea, date uncertain)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1798BornChazeau, France
14 Jun 183335.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Oceania, Pacific (Oceania)
14 Jun 183335.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
22 Dec 183335.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
Mar 1843²45.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Oceania, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jérôme (Étienne) Rouchouze
Bishop Jérôme (Étienne) Rouchouze SS.CC. (born , died Mar 1843) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Oceania

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016