Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valerio Rota

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1662Born
16 Sep 172057.7AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
22 Sep 172057.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Sep 172057.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Oct 172057.8Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno, Italy
8 Sep 173067.7DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Valerio Rota
Bishop Valerio Rota (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 9.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 117
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast