Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Rose

Deceased

Bishop of Senlis, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542¹Born
20 Feb 158442.1AppointedBishop of Senlis, France
6 May 158442.3Ordained BishopBishop of Senlis, France
10 Mar 160260.1DiedBishop of Senlis, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Rose (VIAF: 5044669)
Bishop Guillaume Rose (born 1542, died ) Bishop of Senlis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChaumont, Hte Marne
Ordained BishopCollège de Navarre, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceSenlis, Diocese of Senlis

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 5 Dec 2017