Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Ruzé

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1570²AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
1572²ResignedBishop-Elect of Saint-Malo, France
4 Jul 1572AppointedBishop of Angers, France
24 Aug 1572Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
28 Sep 1587DiedBishop of Angers, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Ruzé (VIAF: 190871805)
Bishop Guillaume Ruzé (died ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 108, and Page 231
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast