Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gualphardus Ridolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1745Born
17 Dec 176823.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180761.8AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
27 Dec 180762.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
9 Sep 181872.8DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gualphardus Ridolfi
Bishop Gualphardus Ridolfi (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast