Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Andrea Cardinal Mercurio

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1518¹Born
20 Feb 154527.1AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
20 Sep 154527.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
30 May 155032.4AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
20 Nov 155133.8Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155133.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Barbara
18 Aug 155335.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
19 Jan 156042.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
2 Feb 156143.0DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Mercurio
Giovanni Andrea Cardinal Mercurio (born 1518, died ) Archbishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Ordained BishopLateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceApostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Marcello, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
  • a cardinal for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 301, and Page 242
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018