Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Papirio Picedi

Deceased

Bishop of Parma, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1528Born
159668.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 160375.0AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
19 Jan 160375.0Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
30 Aug 160678.6AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
4 Mar 161486.1DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Papirio Picedi
Bishop Papirio Picedi (born 1528, died ) Bishop of Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArcola di Lunigiana

  • a priest for 18.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 275, and Page 124
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 39, Number 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast