Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Valier

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹Born
13 Feb 159130.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Verona, Italy
13 Feb 159130.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
23 May 160645.3SucceededBishop of Verona, Italy
1 Sep 163069.6DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alberto Valier (VIAF: 307330229)
Bishop Alberto Valier (born 1561, died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopBrescia, Diocese of Brescia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast