Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Otto Cardinal Truchseß von Waldburg

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1514BornScheer
10 May 154329.2SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
1 Jun 154329.3ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
Sep 154329.5Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
Sep 154329.5Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
19 Dec 154430.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 Nov 154531.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
28 Feb 155036.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
14 Apr 156147.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
18 May 156248.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
12 Apr 157056.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
3 Jul 157056.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
2 Apr 157359.1DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Otto Truchseß von Waldburg:
Otto Cardinal Truchseß von Waldburg (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
  • a cardinal for 28.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Mar 2014