Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Flores

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1502SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
29 Nov 1503ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
31 Jan 1537AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
3 May 1540DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pedro Flores
Bishop Pedro Flores (died ) Bishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 303, and Page 200
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 20, Number 30
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast