Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Rodrigo Carvajal

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy

Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1523AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
20 Feb 1523AppointedPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
9 Dec 1526Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
1539DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Carvajal
Patriarch Rodrigo Carvajal (died 1539) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 199, and Page 210
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,500, Page 39, Number 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1526, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,487
  • ~ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast