Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista (Giovanni Battista) Campeggio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1507²Born
30 May 153932.4AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
28 Feb 154134.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
4 Nov 155851.8ResignedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
7 Apr 158376.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Mallorca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista (Giovanni Battista) Campeggio (VIAF: 39717154)
Bishop Juan Bautista (Giovanni Battista) Campeggio (born 1507, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy

  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 53, Number 284
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 233
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast