Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Arcangelo Pirone

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1840Born
24 Sep 186626.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 189656.3AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
6 Dec 189656.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
6 Feb 190968.5DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Arcangelo Pirone
Bishop Michele Arcangelo Pirone (born , died ) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvellino, Diocese of Avellino
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017