Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cándido Piñol y Batres

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Granada

Titular Bishop of Phaselis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1878BornGuatemala
21 Jan 190123.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Guatemala
2 Mar 190123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Guatemala
10 Dec 191335.9AppointedBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
22 Mar 191436.1Ordained BishopBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
10 Jul 191537.4ResignedBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
10 Jul 191537.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Phaselis
27 Jul 197092.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Granada, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for José Cándido Piñol y Batres:
Bishop José Cándido Piñol y Batres (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Granada

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 56.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013