Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Ferenc Pierer, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

Titular Bishop of Tinum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1731BornTrausdorf
15 Sep 176028.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
20 Sep 176028.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
19 Feb 177947.2SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
12 Jul 177947.6ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
12 Jul 177947.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinum
15 Aug 177947.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinum
5 Jul 180573.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Ferenc Pierer:
Bishop József Ferenc Pierer S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 408, and Page 453
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015