Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Maria Petrarca

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1822BornCarinaro
1 Nov 184523.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187249.4AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
3 Mar 187350.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
26 Dec 189573.2DiedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Petrarca:
Archbishop Francesco Maria Petrarca (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013