Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Penna, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605²Born
9 Apr 166358.2AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
15 Apr 166358.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
2 Jul 166459.5DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Penna (VIAF: 193122228)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Penna O.S.A. (born 1605, died ) Bishop of Bisceglie

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia
Ordained BishopSant’Agostino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 22
  • b/c2: AT, 7 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Nov 2018

Quantcast