Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Peregrin Paulitsch

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1757BornGleinach
16 Jul 177417.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gurk, Austria
9 Feb 182466.7SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
30 May 182467.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
5 Jan 182769.6DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Jakob Peregrin Paulitsch
Bishop Jakob Peregrin Paulitsch (born , died ) Bishop of Gurk

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Jun 2016