Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Tomás Garcia Martinez (de Villanueva), O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1486²Born
25 Nov 151731.0ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
18 Dec 151832.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
10 Oct 154457.9AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
7 Dec 154458.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
8 Sep 155568.8DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
1 Nov 1658Canonized

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Tomás Garcia Martinez (de Villanueva) (VIAF: 100217282)
Archbishop St. Tomás Garcia Martinez (de Villanueva) O.E.S.A. (born Nov 1486, died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuenlíana, Diocese of Ciudad Rodrigo
Ordained BishopSan Agustin, Church, Valladolid, Diocese of Palencia
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 55, Number 304
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 325
  • bd/prof/op: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1544, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Sep 2017