Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban Almeida

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1539AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
11 Jan 1540Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
2 Jun 1542AppointedBishop of León, Spain
16 Apr 1546AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
23 Mar 1563DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Esteban Almeida:
Bishop Esteban Almeida (died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013