Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Orsini

Deceased

Bishop of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹Born
1618¹33.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 162136.6AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
21 Sep 162136.7Ordained BishopBishop of Venafro, Italy
20 Sep 163247.7AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
1640²55.0DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Orsini:
Bishop Ottavio Orsini , Bishop of Segni

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 361, and Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015