Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ninot y Bardera

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1664AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
21 Dec 1664Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
11 Jun 1668AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
15 Jun 1673DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Ninot y Bardera
Bishop José Ninot y Bardera (died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Coloma de Queralt

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 227
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 199, Number 1,250
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,664, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast