Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Copons i de Teixidor

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹BornIgualada
22 Dec 167051.0AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
8 Mar 167151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
16 Mar 168161.2DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Copons i de Teixidor:
Bishop Pedro de Copons i de Teixidor (died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 399
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,034
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 206, Number 1,290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013