Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Nicolai

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ripatransone, Italy

Titular Bishop of Arethusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1834Born
19 Sep 185723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ripatransone, Italy
23 Jun 189056.3AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
29 Jun 189056.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
1899¹64.8ResignedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
18 Apr 190066.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
29 Sep 190066.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Nicolai (VIAF: 89314898)
Bishop Giacinto Nicolai (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ripatransone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonteprandone, Diocese of Ripatransone
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Villa Lante, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 119, and Page 483
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017