Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Sozi Carafa, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1704Born
7 Jun 172723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
15 Jul 174339.3AppointedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
25 Jul 174339.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
15 Nov 175147.6AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
19 Feb 178378.9DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Sozi Carafa
Bishop Alfonso Sozi Carafa C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Nicola de Manfredi

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 261, and Page 440

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast