Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Guzmán Cornejo

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1640SelectedBishop of Tuy, Spain
8 Oct 1640ConfirmedBishop of Tuy, Spain
Dec 1640³Ordained BishopBishop of Tuy, Spain
29 Aug 1642DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Guzmán Cornejo
Bishop Antonio Guzmán Cornejo (died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCifuentes

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,853
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,500, Page 169, Number 1,057
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast