Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Milana

Deceased

Bishop of Nicosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1782BornPalermo
20 Sep 180624.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 185068.1SelectedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
17 Feb 185168.5ConfirmedBishop of Nicosia, Italy
21 Apr 185168.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nicosia, Italy
6 Sep 185876.0DiedBishop of Nicosia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Milana:
Bishop Camillo Milana (born , died ) Bishop of Nicosia

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013