Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Bossi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Naxos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹BornMilano
28 Nov 172949.9AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
23 Apr 173050.3Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
22 Nov 173050.8AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
7 Oct 173252.7DiedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Bossi:
Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Bossi O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Archbishop of Naxos

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 367
  • ob/c2+: CB, 2 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,038

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015