Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Merizzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vigevano

Titular Archbishop of Mocissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1834BornTirano
28 Mar 185722.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 189157.3AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
20 Dec 189157.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
28 Nov 189864.3ResignedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
28 Nov 189864.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
21 Aug 190268.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
22 Mar 191681.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Merizzi:
Archbishop Giacomo Merizzi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vigevano

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 100, and Page 389
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013