Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonino Merciai, O.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq

Titular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1811³Born
11 Dec 184837.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq
11 Dec 184837.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis
28 Jan 184937.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis
22 Oct 185039.6DiedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonino Merciai (VIAF: 304912307)
Archbishop Antonino Merciai O.P. (born Mar 1811, died ) Apostolic Delegate of Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBibbiena in Casentino, Italy
Ordained BishopChiesa di Santo Spirito, Siena, Archdiocese of Siena, Italy

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 547
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,849, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast