Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Domenico Francesco Mensini

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1801BornSiena
20 Sep 182322.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 183736.5AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
12 Nov 183736.6Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
29 Apr 185857.1DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Francesco Mensini:
Bishop Giovanni Domenico Francesco Mensini (born , died ) Bishop of Grosseto

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013