Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Flavien Zacharie Melki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)

Titular Archbishop of Amida dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1899BornKalatmara
3 May 192525.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 196363.7SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
6 Jul 196363.8ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
6 Jul 196363.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida dei Siri
15 Aug 196364.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amida dei Siri
20 Nov 198990.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Flavien Zacharie Melki:
Archbishop Flavien Zacharie Melki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015