Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grégoire Pierre Melki

Patriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian)

Titular Bishop of Batnae dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1939 BornHassaké
8 Aug 196525.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 200262.2AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian), Palestine
25 Feb 200262.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Batnae dei Siri
18 May 200262.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Batnae dei Siri

MicroData Summary for Grégoire Pierre Melki:
Bishop Grégoire Pierre Melki (born ) Patriarchal Exarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchal Exarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,186
  • 2b34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013