Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clément Georges Schelhoth

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Damas (Syrian), Syria

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1920Born
10 May 194524.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 197251.5AppointedArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
8 Sep 197251.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
4 Sep 197857.7ResignedArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
4 Sep 197857.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria dei Siri
4 Oct 199170.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Damas (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Clément Georges Schelhoth
Archbishop Clément Georges Schelhoth (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Syrian)

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,551

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast