Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ignace Moussa I (Basile) Cardinal Daoud

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1930BornMeskané
17 Oct 195424.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 197746.8SelectedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
22 Jul 197746.8ConfirmedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
18 Sep 197747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
1 Jul 199463.8SelectedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
6 Jul 199463.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
13 Oct 199868.1SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
13 Oct 199868.1SelectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
20 Oct 199868.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
20 Oct 199868.1ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
25 Oct 199868.1InstalledPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
25 Nov 200070.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
8 Jan 200170.3ResignedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
8 Jan 200170.3ResignedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
21 Feb 200170.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Apr 200574.5CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
21 Apr 200574.6ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
9 Jun 200776.7RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
7 Apr 201281.6DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ignace Moussa I (Basile) Daoud:
Cardinal Ignace Moussa I (Basile) Daoud (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
  • a cardinal for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2007
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 7 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013