Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Mártonfi

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1746³BornSzékelyszentkirály
28 Oct 176317.8ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
24 Sep 177529.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
1 Oct 177529.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Mar 179953.2SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
2 Apr 180054.2ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
9 Nov 180054.8Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
3 Mar 181569.1DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József Mártonfi:
Bishop József Mártonfi (born , died ) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013