Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Marroquín Hurtado

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478Born
18 Dec 153456.9AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
8 Apr 153759.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
19 Apr 156385.2DiedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Francisco Marroquín Hurtado
Bishop Francisco Marroquín Hurtado (born 1478, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantander, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mexico, Diocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 47, Number 249
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 207
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018