Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Ribera de Toledo

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1507AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
1508²Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
29 Oct 1511AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
6 Feb 1543DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Ribera de Toledo:
Bishop Diego Ribera de Toledo (died ) Bishop of Segovia

  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2?: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,486
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 25, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013