Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Lopez de Zárate

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1490Born
21 Jun 153544.9AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
8 Apr 153746.7Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
10 Sep 155565.2DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Juan Lopez de Zárate
Bishop Juan Lopez de Zárate (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviedo, Diocese of Oviedo, Spain
Ordained BishopMexico, Diocese of México, Federal District
Death PlaceMexico, Diocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 47, Number 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 111
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast