Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory John Mansour

Bishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1955 Born
18 Sep 198226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
19 Feb 199438.2IncardinatedPriest of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA
10 Jan 200448.1AppointedBishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
2 Mar 200448.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA
27 Apr 200448.4InstalledBishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite), New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Gregory John Mansour
Bishop Gregory John Mansour (born ) Bishop of Saint Maron of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlint, MI

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Maron of Brooklyn (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,541
  • c1: CB, 20 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast