Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Loyero

Deceased

Bishop of Nicastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1676Born
18 Apr 169922.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172144.6AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
26 Jan 172144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
6 Aug 173155.1AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
24 Dec 173660.5DiedBishop of Nicastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Loyero
Bishop Francesco Maria Loyero (born , died ) Bishop of Nicastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBadolato

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 398
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast