Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Tarugi

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1690BornMontepulciano
10 Jun 171323.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 172939.5AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
31 Dec 172939.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi, Italy
14 Sep 173545.2DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Tarugi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Tarugi (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013