Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel López Aguirre

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1690Born
22 Jul 175060.5AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
13 Sep 175060.6Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
7 Feb 175464.0DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel López Aguirre
Bishop Manuel López Aguirre (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 69, Number 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast