Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ladrón de Guevara, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1695Born
22 Jul 175055.4AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
27 Sep 175055.6Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
9 Mar 175560.1DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ladrón de Guevara
Bishop Juan Ladrón de Guevara O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Barbastro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePedraza de la Sierra

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 69, Number 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018