Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innocenzo Maria Lirutti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1741Born
21 Dec 176524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Sep 180765.9AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
27 Dec 180766.2Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
11 Aug 182785.8DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Maria Lirutti
Bishop Innocenzo Maria Lirutti O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafreda

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 28
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 393

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast