Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Ly Jing Feng (Li Jingfeng)

Deceased

Bishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1921Born
29 Jun 194726.4Ordained PriestPriest
1950²28.9SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China
25 Apr 198059.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China
14 Feb 198362.0SucceededBishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China
17 Nov 201796.8DiedBishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucas Ly Jing Feng (Li Jingfeng)
Bishop Lucas Ly Jing Feng (Li Jingfeng) (born , died ) Bishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTongyuanfang, Gaoling county
Death PlaceFengxiang, Diocese of Fengxiang [Fengsiang]

  • a priest for 70.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,018, Page 1,134
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,294
  • b/c2+: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast